TREFOREST CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 03 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Khalid Karim | Chair | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bara Ashi | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Mohamed Elsharoud | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS:- TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN PONTYPRIDD FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS:- 1. PROVIDING A PLACE OF WORSHIP, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, OUTREACH AND PASTORAL CARE IN THE COMMUNITY; 2. SPREADING THE KNOWLEDGE, TEACHINGS, AND SPIRIT OF ISLAM AS PREACHED AND EXEMPLIFIED BY THE QURAN AND SUNNAH OF PROPHET MOHAMMED (P.B.U.H); 3. ENCOURAGING AND HELPING MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL MUSLIM COMMUNITY IN PERFORMING THEIR CONGREGATION DAILY PRAYERS, CELEBRATING THEIR HOLY DAYS (ACCORDING TO QURAN AND SUNNAH), AND TO LEARN MORE ABOUT ISLAM THOROUGH ORGANIZED TALKS AND CONFERENCES; 4. HELPING AND ENCOURAGING LOCAL MUSLIM COLLABORATION TO BUILD AND RUN THE MASJID(S), SCHOOLS, ISLAMIC CULTURAL AND COMMUNITY CENTRE(S) AND THE LIKE; 5. PROMOTING PEACE AND THE UNITY OF MUSLIMS; 6. CO-OPERATING AND WORKING WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS HAVING SIMILAR AIMS; 7. PROMOTING PEACE AND HARMONY WITH ALL THE COMMUNITIES INCLUDING THE NON-MUSLIMS; 8. ENCOURAGING AND ESTABLISHING THE FIVE CONGREGATIONAL DAILY PRAYERS AT ITS HEADQUARTERS; 9. ENDEAVOURING TO HOLD ISLAMIC GATHERINGS, ISLAMIC STUDY SESSION, CONFERENCES, TALKS AND THE LIKE; 10. PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION FOR A LIMITED NUMBER OF MUSLIM STUDENTS WHO SHALL BE EXPECTED TO COMPLY WITH CERTAIN ISLAMIC RULES LAID DOWN TO GOVERN THEIR STAYING IN THE ACCOMMODATION; AND 11. MAINTAINING A LIBRARY ON ISLAMIC LITERATURE; NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
Treforest Cultural Centre
Broadway. PONTYPRIDD
CF37 1BH
- Phone:
- 07926174651
- Email:
- khalidkarimsamma@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window