LLANFAELOG VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Llanfaelog Community Hub is managed for the use of inhabitants of the parish of Llanfaelog Anglesey ( hereinafter called ' the area of benefit ' ) without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes, and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 03 May 2023: CIO registration
- NEUADD GYMUNEDOL LLANFAELOG (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carron White | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Roberts | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Rawsthorn | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Eric Williams | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 May 2023
Charitable objects
MAINTAIN LLANFAELOG COMMUNITY HUB FOR THE USE OF INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LLANFAELOG ANGLESEY ( HEREINAFTER CALLED ' THE AREA OF BENEFIT ' ) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF LLANFAELOG ANGLESEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lee House
Llanfaelog
TY CROES
Gwynedd
LL63 5TB
- Phone:
- 07812409866
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window