HAKUNA MATATA ANIMAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hakuna Matata Animal Trust is an animal sanctuary based in South Devon. We focus on the care and protection of animals and provide a permanent residence where they will live out their lives here at the sanctuary. We also find permanent homes for our smaller, younger rescues. We participate in and help to fund animal rescue missions for animals that would otherwise be euthanized or slaughtered.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 18 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jay Prescott | Chair | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kaci Prescott Prescott | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Harvey Fraser Fraser | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Rees Rees | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Alan Hines Hines | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dianne McBride | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor McBride | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 May 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Hambleton Way
PAIGNTON
DEVON
TQ4 7QH
- Phone:
- 07488235825
- Email:
- hmanimaltrust@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window