LET'S DANCE AGAIN CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide an organised monthly event and also a weekly coffee morning for people aged 65-95. We hold these activities at Wednesbury Town Hall. We plan and organise hot lunches, live entertainment, raffles, drinks and snacks. Our volunteers create and craft decorations for the themed events. We provide a friendly service to our elderly community, supporting their well being to assist them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,392 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sandwell
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 24 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Costigan | Chair | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debora Dawn Price | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Hipkiss | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS AND SOCIAL ISOLATION OF ELDERLY PEOPLE [AGED OVER 60] RESIDENT IN SANDWELL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING A LUNCH CLUB, EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND A BEFRIENDING SERVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Constantine Way
BILSTON
West Midlands
WV14 8GX
- Phone:
- 07951717116
- Email:
- letsdanceagain2021@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window