IMPERMANENCE DANCE THEATRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit to promote the arts, particularly but not exclusively, the arts of dance and contemporary music by the development and production of live performances, films, digital media, and related workshops and classes.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 November 2023: Standard registration
- IMPERMANENCE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Rolt | Chair | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Andrew Jackson | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hay | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cleo Alberta Lake | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Yedigaroff | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 OCT 2023 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 NOV 2023 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE ARTS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE ARTS OF DANCE AND CONTEMPORARY MUSIC BY THE DEVELOPMENT AND PRODUCTION OF LIVE PERFORMANCES, FILMS, DIGITAL MEDIA AND RELATED WORKSHOPS AND CLASSES
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MOUNT WITHOUT
UPPER CHURCH LANE
BRISTOL
BS2 8FN
- Phone:
- 07531241097
- Email:
- info@impermanence.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.