ADA LOVELACE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PTA aims to: raise funds for Ada Lovelace CofE High School in Ealing London; to build community relationships within Ealing; and to promote the physical and social development of children at the school. Activities undertaken by the PTA include: Refreshments at Christmas, Spring and Summer concerts, Christmas Raffle, Quiz & Curry Night, Yr7 - Yr9 Discos, and Uniform Sales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ealing
Governance
- 06 March 2023: Standard registration
- ADA LOVELACE C OF E SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marianne Claire Ellis | Chair | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Busca | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Bobrowska | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Claire Win | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robinson | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 September 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 September 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ADA LOVELACE C OF E HIGH SCHOOL
PARK VIEW ROAD
LONDON
W5 2JX
- Phone:
- 02035400200
- Email:
- pta@adalovelace.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window