EDITH COLE MEMORIAL PARK

Charity number: 521493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Small park for the use of the residents of Scraptoft

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 November 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SCRAPTOFT PARISH COUNCIL Trustee 30 August 2009
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 10 December 2024 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 10 December 2024 376 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 11 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 14 December 2020 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Scraptoft Community Hub
Malsbury Avenue
Scraptoft
LEICESTER
LE7 9FQ
Phone:
01164292403