ASHBURTON REPAIR CAFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ashburton Repair Cafe (ARC) promotes the reuse and recycling of household products by offering education on how to repair, and offering a repair service. We do not charge for repairs. People often give a donation for the time taken by our volunteers, and this is entirely voluntary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 24 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL HOWARD CLARKE WARD | Chair | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Austin | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Elizabeth Haywood | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andreas Christopher Noppers | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Malcolm Deas | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Kathleen Holmes | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES EDMUND RICHARD HILL-SMITH | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PHILLIP CRANMER | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.88k | £9.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.53k | £7.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £800 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO PROTECT AND SAFEGUARD THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF REPAIR AND RE-USE OF PRODUCTS AS A MEANS OF PREVENTING AND MINIMISING WASTE DISPOSAL. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF REPAIRING AND REUSING HOUSEHOLD ITEMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 MINERS CLOSE
ASHBURTON
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ13 7FE
- Phone:
- 07906040097
- Website:
-
ashburtonrepaircafe.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window