SOUTH KILWORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Village Hall has a number of regular events inc... Upholstery, Art, Table Tennis, Yoga. It is available for local residents to hire for private functions. It is also the home of the South Kilworth Bowls Club. The Village Hall has a monthly community cafe. The Village Hall committee hold a number of fund raising events throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 17 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Pearson | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Romy Grimwood | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Taylor | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin John Derrick | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
mark tottman | Trustee | 15 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.59k | £23.35k | £34.85k | £74.69k | £19.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.83k | £18.46k | £14.71k | £59.14k | £21.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.00k | £32.49k | £20.23k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2024 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16TH JUNE 1961 as amended on 04 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
SOUTH KILWORTH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Kilworth Village Hall
Leys Crescent
South Kilworth
Lutterworth
LE17 6DS
- Phone:
- 01858571193
- Email:
- skvillagehall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window