BRIDGEND SWIM CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £9,395 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bridgend
Governance
- 27 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Watkins | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Huw Lewis | Trustee |
|
||||||
Mark Jenkins | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David McNally | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PARTICIPATION IN SWIMMING, TRIATHLON, LIFESAVING AND SUCH OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF PROMOTING HEALTHY RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEOL YR YSGOL
TONDU
BRIDGEND
CF32 9ET
- Phone:
- 07886240782
- Email:
- bridgendswimclub@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window