THE GRANT THORNTON FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Grant Thornton Foundation is a charity dedicated to making a positive impact on our communities through strategic funding and support of charities. The Foundation is a tangible demonstration of our values, our dedication to social impact and our commitment to creating a better future for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2025
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 November 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Morrison | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Campbell | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Beighton | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin James Coates | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Kasina Rao | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Lynne Drury | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenn Barnett | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO ORGANISATIONS THAT ARE WORKING: 3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION; 3.2 TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; 3.3 TO PROMOTE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE DEVELOPMENT, EDUCATION AND SUPPORT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; OR 3.4 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 FINSBURY SQUARE
LONDON
EC2A 1AG
- Phone:
- 01908359664
- Email:
- sustainability@uk.gt.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.