THE PARAGON CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1202348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The prevention or relief of poverty in Wisbech and surrounding areas by providing grants for items and services to individuals in need and/or charities or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty and suffering

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,918
Total expenditure: £6,644

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Lincolnshire
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 March 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gary Albert Robinson Chair 20 February 2023
None on record
Susan Jane Robinson Trustee 20 February 2023
None on record
Michael Edward Massen Trustee 20 February 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.92k
Total expenditure £6.64k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
332 SMEETH ROAD
MARSHLAND ST. JAMES
WISBECH
PE14 8EP
Phone:
07879628631
Website:

paragoncharityfoundation.co.uk