LACE HILL ACADEMY PTA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We fundraise, via events and/or grant applications; in order to provide facilities, experiences or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 March 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Elizabeth de Jager | Chair | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andra Vidinei | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Faith Orr | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Anne Watson | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Louise Connelly Bsc DipPFS | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Stock | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Sommerville BAPGdipser | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sanskriti Painuly MBA HR | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 NOV 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LACE HILL ACADEMY
CATCHPIN STREET
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 7RR
- Phone:
- 01280823747
- Email:
- pta@lacehillacademy.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.