THE MAZI PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TEMP to be updated
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 13 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Hagen | Chair | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Hodgson | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peregrine Quinn | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maisie Beatrice Evans | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Craig | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Louise Weir | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lightfoot | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, PARTICULARLY FOR THOSE AGED 16-25 YEARS OLD BY; - THE PROVISION OF SUBSIDISED WEEKLY FOOD BOXES - THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND EDUCATIONAL SESSIONS DESIGNED TO INCREASE COOKING SKILLS AND NUTRITION SO AS TO ENCOURAGE COOKING INDEPENDENCE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2
Whitehouse Lane
BRISTOL
BRISTOL
BS3 4DJ
- Phone:
- 07913669426
- Email:
- hello@themaziproject.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window