NEW ADDINGTON BOXING CLUB

Charity number: 1204852
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

New Addington boxing club offers a variety of activities, including boxing techniques, cardio,circuit training and sparring. These activities aim to improve fitness, develop boxing skills, and provide a social environment. We support and promote mental health and well-being, allowing our members to improve and thrive at their own pace to build confidence and discipline in their everyday lives.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,005
Total expenditure: £6,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Croydon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 September 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louiza-Ann Graham Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Nickan Rajabi Trustee 17 February 2025
None on record
zoe Graham Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.01k
Total expenditure £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Meridian High School
16 Fairchildes Ave
New Addington
Croydon
CR0 0AH
Phone:
07531026806
Website:

No information available