JAMIA BHOPAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG UNDERPRIVILEGED FAMILIES LIVING IN COUNTY BHOPAL IN INDIA, BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES AND PROVIDE MEANS TO INCOME TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO BECOME KNOWLEDGEABLE AND FINANCIALLY SELF SUPPORTIVE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 19 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDUL RAQEEB KHAN | Chair | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL MOJEEB KHAN | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOULANA ABDUL HAFIZ BIBI | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £660 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 May 2023
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN COUNTY OF BHOPAL IN INDIA, BY PROVIDING GOODS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED, SUCH AS FARMING TOOLS TO POOR FAMILIES, MACHINERY TO POOR WIDOWERS SUCH AS SEWING MACHINES AND SUPPORTING ORPHANS AND POOR CHILDREN BY PROVIDING THEM WITH ANY ASSISTANCE AND MATERIALS REQUIRED TO OBTAIN AN EDUCATION. 2. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN COUNTY OF BHOPAL IN INDIA WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS SUCH AS CYCLONES OR FLOODS, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPLYING EMERGENCY RELIEF THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GOODS AND SHELTERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Lodge Road
Aston
BIRMINGHAM
B6 6LU
- Phone:
- 07720849284
- Email:
- ABDURRAQEEB72@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window