RIVERSIDE PERFORMING ARTS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The RPAC will promote and advance the education within the performing arts and service 3 primary, 1 SEND and 1 secondary school with potential for more schools being build in the area. The RPAC will promote equal opportunity for further education and pathways into the creative industries locally and in London. The purpose is to raise the aspirations of cultural participation in the borough.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
Governance
- 02 October 2023: CIO registration
- RPAC (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Roberts | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Serena Madhvani | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Boyd | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew David Archer Scott | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Soren Ramsing | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE PERFORMING ARTS BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A PERFORMING ARTS CENTRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Riverside Campus
Renwick Road
BARKING
IG11 0FU
- Phone:
- 02039465888
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window