BENEFICIAL VERACIOUS CHRIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday Church Service @ 10:30am - 1pm - 3 Peak Hill Avenue, Sydenham, London, SE26 4LG Bible classes @ 7pm-8pm on Tuesdays and 8pm-9pm on Wednesdays and Thursdays via Zoom Friday Prayer meeting @ 7pm - 8pm, except last Friday of the month @ 10:30pm - 12:30am via Zoom Biblical counselling and coaching - on as and when required - via zoom or in-person
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Okonne | Chair | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY BOAKYE-BOATENG | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev REGINA OSEI-GYAMFI | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND SUCH PARTS OF THE PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. TENETS OF FAITH ? WE BELIEVE THAT THE BIBLE IS AN INSPIRED AND INFALLIBLE WORD OF GOD, HAVING FINAL AUTHORITY IN ALL MATTERS. II TIMOTHY 3:16 ? WE BELIEVE IN THE UNITY OF THE HOLY TRINITY: GOD THE FATHER, GOD THE SON AND GOD THE HOLY SPIRIT ARE ONE. JOHN 10:30, 17:21 ? WE BELIEVE IN THE DEITY OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST; IN HIS VIRGIN BIRTH; IN HIS DEATH ON THE CROSS; HIS BURIAL IN THE TOMB; HIS BODILY RESURRECTION AND HIS PHYSICAL ASCENSION TO THE RIGHT HAND OF GOD THE FATHER IN HEAVEN. ? WE BELIEVE IN THE BLESSED HOPE OF JESUS? VISIBLE RETURN TO THIS EARTH, TO RECEIVE TO HIMSELF, HIS BLOOD-BOUGHT CHURCH, THAT THE CHURCH MAY BE WITH HIM FOREVER. ? WE BELIEVE THAT CHRIST SHALL RETURN TO REIGN ON THE EARTH FOR A THOUSAND YEARS. ? WE BELIEVE THAT, AS MANY AS HAVE RECEIVED JESUS CHRIST AS THEIR PERSONAL SAVIOUR THROUGH FAITH WITH THE HEART AND CONFESSION WITH THE MOUTH MUST PUBLICLY IDENTIFY THEMSELVES WITH CHRIST ? HIS DEATH AND RESURRECTION THROUGH BAPTISM BY IMMERSION. ? WE BELIEVE THAT THE ONLY MEANS OF BEING FORGIVEN AND CLEANSED FROM SIN IS THROUGH REPENTANCE AND FAITH IN JESUS CHRIST. ACTS 2:38 ? WE BELIEVE THAT SALVATION IS OBTAINED ONLY THROUGH FAITH IN JESUS CHRIST. EPHESIANS 2:9 ? WE BELIEVE THAT REGENERATION BY THE HOLY SPIRIT IS ESSENTIAL FOR EVERY CHRISTIAN. JOHN 3:3-5, 1 PETER 1:22-23 ? WE BELIEVE THAT BY THE STRIPES OF JESUS CHRIST, HEALING IS PROVIDED FOR THE HUMAN BODY, SOUL AND SPIRIT IN ANSWER TO PRAYER. JAMES 5:14, 1 PETER 1:2-24, ISAIAH 53:5 ? WE BELIEVE THAT CHRIST HAS GIVEN TO THE CHURCH THE POWER TO DESTROY ALL THE WORKS OF SATAN, AND THAT ETERNAL LIFE, WHICH ADAM LOST IN THE GARDEN OF EDEN HAS BEEN MADE AVAILABLE TO THEM WHO BELIEVE IN JESUS CHRIST. JOHN 10:10; 1 JOHN 3:8; MATTHEW 28:18-20 ? WE BELIEVE THAT THE BAPTISM OF THE HOLY SPIRIT ACCORDING TO ACTS 2:4 IS GIVEN TO BELIEVERS THROUGH PRAYER AND LAYING-ON OF HANDS. ACTS 10:44-48; 19:6; 8:17; HEBREWS 6:2 ? WE BELIEVE THAT THE GIFT, MINISTRY, AND FRUIT OF THE HOLY SPIRIT ARE FREELY GIVEN TO BELIEVERS AND MUST BE SEEN IN OPERATION IN THE DAILY WORSHIP OF THE CHURCH AND THE EVERYDAY LIFE OF BELIEVERS. ? WE BELIEVE IN THE RESURRECTION OF THE DEAD; THE SAVED AND THE LOST, THE FORMER TO EVERLASTING LIFE, AND THE LATTER TO EVERLASTING DAMNATION. JOHN 5:29 ? WE BELIEVE THAT CIVIL GOVERNMENTS ARE DIVINELY APPOINTED FOR THE INTEREST AND GOOD OF HUMAN SOCIETY, AND THE CHURCH OWES A DUTY TO PRAY FOR AND RESPECT IT. ? WE BELIEVE THAT THE FIRST DAY OF THE WEEK (SUNDAY) IS THE DAY OF THE LORD AND SHOULD BE KEPT HOLY FOR CORPORATE WORSHIP OF THE LORD. ACTS 20:7; REVELATION 1:10 ? WE BELIEVE THAT THE SHARING OF BREAD AND WINE IN THE LORD?S SUPPER IN A SYMBOL OF SHARING THE BODY AND BLOOD OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST. PARTAKERS DO SO AS OFTEN AS THEY DO IN REMEMBRANCE OF THE DEATH AND RESURRECTION OF JESUS. LUKE 22
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 PEAK HILL AVENUE
LONDON
SE26 4LG
- Phone:
- 02076394058
- Email:
- benchrist1@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window