AL IMDAAD AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THOSE IN NEED
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bangladesh
- Dubai
- Egypt
- India
- Jordan
- Malaysia
- Nepal
- Sri Lanka
- Turkey
Governance
- 08 March 2023: CIO registration
- AICT GLOBAL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUHAMMAD PATEL | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Ghodawala | Trustee | 31 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ISMAIL MOHAMED SALLEH | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG POOR PEOPLE, WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER, CLOTHING, LIVELIHOOD PROGRAMMES, COSTS FOR ATTENDING SCHOOL AND MEDICAL TREATMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A MOAT ROAD
LEICESTER
LE5 5EF
- Phone:
- 01165072588
- Email:
- admin@aictglobal.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window