DMU GROUP (WEST MIDLANDS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The restoration, maintenance and operation of a 5 car Diesel Multiple Unit Train which runs on the Severn Valley Railway from Kidderminster to Bridgnorth in Worcestershire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 16 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Cooper | Chair | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Wright | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Coley | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM THOMPSON | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Lawrence Austin Mortimer | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin John Darby | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND LEARNING BY PRESERVING, RESTORING, MAINTAINING AND OPERATING VINTAGE DIESEL SINGLE AND/OR MULTIPLE UNIT PASSENGER RAIL VEHICLES ON A SUITABLE HERITAGE RAILWAY OR RAILWAYS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
VOLUNTEER LIAISON OFFICE
PLATFORM 1
RAILWAY STATION
BEWDLEY
DY12 1DP
- Phone:
- 07575999509
- Email:
- dmugrpwm@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window