READ EASY DERBY & DISTRICT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a free, one-to-one coaching programme to help adults learn to read.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 19 April 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan John Livsey | Chair | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Styles | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Sturman | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amina Rashid | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Elisabeth Courtney | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Ruth Anne Hodgson | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Smith | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JILL DOREEN REED | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
AMY LOUISE BRISTOW | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER FIONA HENLEY | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £502 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 JUL 2021 as amended on 23 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE ADULT PUBLIC IN LITERACY WITHIN THE DERBY CITY, AMBER VALLEY, EREWASH AND SOUTH DERBYSHIRE (GEOGRAPHICAL) AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Farnborough Gardens
Allestree
DERBY
DE22 2UU
- Phone:
- 07852259112
- Email:
- derbyleader@readeasy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window