THE LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage the provision of recreational facilities for all age groups with particular attention being paid to the needs of village communities. To provide technical advice & information & carry out research on the planning, design & construction of facilities. To specialise in recreation for children & young people and to raise funds and arrange grants in furtherance of these objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 29 October 1968: Standard registration
- 06 September 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 06 September 2023: Funds transferred to 1077645 RURAL COMMUNITY COUNCIL (LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAN...
- THE LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND COUNTY PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE LEICESTERSHIRE PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.63k | £1.85k | £2.37k | £1.92k | £1.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.32k | £6.50k | £6.69k | £6.57k | £7.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST OCTOBER 1953 AS AMENDED 10TH OCTOBER 1967, 27 NOVEMBER 1984, 6 OCTOBER 1992 AND 7 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVISE ON AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ADEQUATE PLAYING FIELDS AND PLAYGROUNDS IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA FOR THE PURPOSE OF OUTDOOR GAMES, SPORTS AND PASTIMES WITH A VIEW TO PROMOTING THE PHYSICAL AND MORAL WELFARE AND THE SAFETY OF THE POPULATION.
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window