DARTMOOR PONY SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 March 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Tyler | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christine Anderson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Weston | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Alison Bronwen Wilmot | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Elizabeth May Houghton | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lewis Anderson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Bridie Ann Mason | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David John Jordan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Wendy Mary Watson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Diana Mary Alford | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jacqueline Newbery | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jane Walker | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 AUG 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 NOV 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 NOV 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 DEC 2021 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 FEB 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE BREEDING OF THE DARTMOOR PONY TO ENSURE THE PRESERVATION OF THE BREED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS PURPOSE THE SOCIETY WILL: (A) ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE BREEDING OF REGISTERED PURE DARTMOOR PONIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; (B) ENCOURAGE THE BREEDING OF PURE DARTMOOR PONIES ON DARTMOOR; (C) IMPROVE THE CONFORMATION OF THE BREED WITHOUT ALTERING THE ESSENTIAL CHARACTERISTICS OF THE DARTMOOR PONY; (D) ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE PRODUCTION OF THE DARTMOOR PONY AS A CHILD’S PONY UNDER SADDLE; (E) MAINTAIN THE DARTMOOR PONY SOCIETY STUD BOOK; AND (F) PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF DARTMOOR PONIES AND ALSO, WHERE THE COUNCIL CONSIDER THAT IT IS POSSIBLE, TO HELP PREVENT NEGLECT OR CRUELTY TO DARTMOOR PONIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BIRKS COTTAGE FARM
BIRKS ROAD
HEDDON-ON-THE-WALL
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE15 0HF
- Phone:
- 01914290400
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.