PROTECT AND HELP THE POOR AND NEEDY INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dedicated to raising funds in the UK through a variety of activities, including charity galas and direct marketing to our donors to support impactful projects in Kenya and Uganda. Our initiatives focus on disabled persons, livelihood support, women's empowerment, and education support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Bradford City
- Ealing
- Leicestershire
- Kenya
- Uganda
Governance
- 23 November 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMED IFTIKHAR QADIR | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tayab Keval | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mala Kohli Anand | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 NOV 2023 as amended on 20 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
The prevention or relief of poverty in Kenya and Uganda by providing: grants, items and services to individuals in need and/or charities, or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty;
Contact information
- Address:
-
204 FIELD END ROAD
PINNER
HA5 1RD
- Phone:
- 07985372860
- Email:
- Ifthikhar.qadir@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.