ASSOCIATED PHOTOJOURNALISM FOR ART & CULTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
APAC promotes public participation in the arts through community arts projects designed to foster and disseminate knowledge on cultures, traditions, and the daily life of people in Ireland, United Kingdom and other parts of the World. It uses the arts as a medium for promoting understanding, tolerance and respect between individuals, communities, cultures and nations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bulgaria
- Ireland
- Moldova
- Northern Ireland
- Romania
- Ukraine
Governance
- 31 May 2023: Standard registration
- APAC ASSOCIATED PHOTOJOURNALISM FOR ART & CULTURE (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON FINLAY | Chair | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Christopher Britten | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDY POLLACK | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
LOIS MARY HOUSTON | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 AUG 2005 AS AMENDED ON 30 MAY 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF, AND EDUCATION IN, THE ARTS, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) VISUAL AND PERFORMING ARTS, PHOTOJOURNALISM AND DOCUMENTARY, PHOTOGRAPHY, DRAMA, PERFORMANCE AND MUSIC, BY USING THE VISUAL AND PERFORMING ARTS AS A MEANS OF PROMOTING PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS THROUGH COMMUNITY ARTS PROJECTS DESIGNED TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE ON CULTURES, TRADITIONS AND THE DAILY LIFE OF PEOPLE IN IRELAND, UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AND AS A MEDIUM FOR PROMOTING UNDERSTANDING, TOLERANCE AND RESPECT BETWEEN INDIVIDUALS, COMMUNITIES, CULTURES AND NATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WHITE COTTAGE
OVER WALLOP
STOCKBRIDGE
Hampshire
OVER WALLOP
SO20 8HT
- Phone:
- 07565549557
- Email:
- martin.nangle@rocketmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window