THE CHILDREN'S ALLIANCE CIO - THE WATER BABIES FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Children's Alliance has been set up to give children and young people access to water; this can be in the form of swimming lessons, transport to lessons, water activities that support mental and physical health, specialist swimwear and other similar projects. Grants are given to individual projects.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 October 2023: CIO registration
- THE CHILDREN'S ALLIANCE (Working name)
- THE CHILDREN'S ALLIANCE CIC (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Isaac | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Howard Harrison | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Sara Khojasteh | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Haigh-Reeve | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trudi Louise Beswick | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MAKING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS TO: 3.1 PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY IMPROVING ACCESS TO WATER AND INCREASING PARTICIPATION IN PHYSICAL ACTIVITY; AND 3.2 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE ESPECIALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH COMMISSIONING RESEARCH INTO, AND HOLDING CONFERENCES IN RELATION TO, CHILDREN’S HEALTH, WELFARE, WELLBEING AND DEVELOPMENT AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC AND RAISING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF SUCH MATTERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CHILDREN'S ALLIANCE
WINSLADE HOUSE
MANOR DRIVE
CLYST ST. MARY
EXETER
EX5 1FY
- Phone:
- 07774693609
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.