COSY COATS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of new warm coats to children in deprived areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Francis Goodall | Chair | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Agnes Goodall | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Goodall | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY PROVIDING FREE NEW WARM COATS TO IMPOVERISHED CHILDREN OR TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS WHO ARE ALSO WORKING TO RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 SAMPSON AVENUE
BRAMSHALL
UTTOXETER
ST14 5FG
- Phone:
- 07884002303
- Email:
- grahamgoodall@msn.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window