MUKUJU SAINTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity allocates funds from donations and grants to support vital initiatives in Uganda, with a primary focus on food, water, electricity projects, and providing education. By focusing on these areas, we strive to foster sustainable community development and improve the quality of life for those we serve.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Uganda
Governance
- 28 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joao Eduardo Braz Pessoa | Chair | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rita Marisa da Silva Ferreira Rosa Henriques | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Littleton | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £756 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Apr 2023 as amended on 26 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF EXTREME POVERTY CONDITIONS IN MUKUJU, UGANDA VIA FOOD AND ESSENTIAL DONATIONS, EDUCATION AND THE SUPPORT AND SET UP OF SERVICES SUCH AS WATER AND POWER. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment 272
2 KELSO PLACE
MANCHESTER
- Phone:
- 07753967776
- Email:
- info@mukujusaints.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window