UNITE US

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
- Haringey
Governance
- 03 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABRAHAM SCHECHTER | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Leah Weiss | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN PARTS OF THE UK AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE BY: A) PROVIDING RELEVANT ADVICE, INFORMATION, ASSISTANCE, TRAINING AND PEER SUPPORT TO SCHOOL STAFF, FAMILIES AND CARERS DESIGNED TO ENABLE THEM TO BETTER SUPPORT THEIR CHILDREN B) PROVIDING RELEVANT TRAINING TO OTHER INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS INVOLVED IN THE LIVES OF SUCH CHILDREN DESIGNED TO ENABLE THEM TO BE BETTER EQUIPPED TO PROVIDE APPROPRIATE SERVICES AND SUPPORT FOR THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 MOUNDFIELD ROAD
LONDON
N16 6TB
- Phone:
- 07747251829
- Email:
- r.ollech@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window