MASJID SALAHADDIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 June 2023: Standard registration
- SALAHADDIN?ISLAMIC?CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kamal Abdullah Rahman Ibrahim | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nergz Ibrahim Babakr | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Iqbal Faeq Hassan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Saman Mohammed Saeed | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03 APR 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, IN THE UK, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (A) HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS (B) LECTURES AND COURSES (C) PRODUCING AND/ OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAM, AND ANY OTHER MEANS DEEMED APPROPRIATE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MASJID SALAHUDDIN
24 CRACKENEDGE LANE
DEWSBURY
WF13 1RB
- Phone:
- 07475075651
- Email:
- saladin.c100@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window