Financial history 1ST FORTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.44k £24.04k £22.86k £24.80k £17.08k
Total expenditure £13.27k £5.41k £10.97k £23.79k £16.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.67k £11.87k N/A N/A