DEBRE BISRAT ST GABRIEL TIGRAYAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday mass services, Holy Communion, Holy mass once a month on St Gabriel's day, yearly annual anniversary, baptizing children and adults, wedding Solemnization, memorial services, Befriending and counselling support for the elderly, visiting the elderly and the sick, bible Study, choir rehearsal every Saturdays, Sunday School conferences and periodically fundraising event.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 March 2023: CIO registration
- 24 August 2023: Funds received from 1123625 DEBRE BISRAT ST GABRIEL TIGRAYAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GEBREGEORGIS DIMTSU PHD | Chair | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martha Asgede | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Genet Yohannes | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Haftai Desta | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aster Tafere | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Teka Haile | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Zerai Haileselase | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
AYNALEM MEBRATU | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Meaza Hailemicheal | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE OBJECTS OF THE DEBRE BISRAT ST GABRIEL TIGRAYAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH (CIO) ARE TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINE, DOGMA AND PRINCIPLE OF THE ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH IN TIGRAY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CIO MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFILL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CIO. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISED AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Judes & St. Pauls Church
113 Mildmay Grove North
LONDON
N1 4PL
- Phone:
- 07476928798
- Email:
- stgabriellondon@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window