THE FORE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fore provide charities and social enterprises with a wraparound package of unrestricted, multi-year grant-funding (up to £30,000); training; skilled volunteers; peer-to-peer networks; and impact measurement. The Fore bring together businesses, trusts and foundations, philanthropists and individuals who want to create impact by sharing their skills and resources with the best small charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Edward Tye | Chair | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Murigi | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Richard Gethin | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Alon Avner | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rebecca Arkwell Verwoert | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Rich | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward James Forsyth Lawson | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Louise Duckworth | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Frances Rodwell | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Baroness Diana Harding | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Boakye | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
V107, Vox Studios
1-45 Durham Street
London
SE11 5JH
- Phone:
- 07858 339 981
- Email:
- info@thefore.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.