THE COLLECTIVE AID CHARITABLE FOUNDATION.

Charity number: 1206028
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Collective Aid Charitable Foundation (CACF) exists to facilitate the delivery of adaptive and multidisciplinary support to people on the move in Europe who are survivors of war, disaster and catastrophe by providing grants, advice and services to Collective Aid field programmes operating within the International Collaborative Framework of Collective Aid (ICFCA).

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Bosnia And Herzegovina
  • France
  • Serbia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 December 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • COLLECTIVE AID (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amber Bauer Trustee 13 December 2024
ForRefugees
Received: On time
REFUGEE BIRIYANI & BANANAS
Received: On time
Matthew Cowling Trustee 11 June 2024
None on record
Roanna Kong Trustee 08 June 2024
None on record
BRYCE CLEBORNE-BERUBE Trustee 15 January 2024
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
57 Preston Street
FAVERSHAM
Kent
ME13 8PG
Phone:
+34636022971