SOBERISTAS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Soberistas CIO provides a social network website offering peer support to people who wish to stop drinking alcohol. The Soberistas website features blogs, a forum, a chat room and multiple additional resources intended to inspire, educate and motivate its members to maintain an alcohol-free life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Australia
- Austria
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Egypt
- Estonia
- Ethiopia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Grenada
- Guernsey
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jersey
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Madagascar
- Malaysia
- Malta
- Mexico
- Moldova
- Morocco
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Norway
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Russia
- Saudi Arabia
- Serbia
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Gambia
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Uzbekistan
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 24 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Jane Naisbitt | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Michael Thomas Morgan | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christina Jane Hallett | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Stuart Tovey | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT, INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY: 3.1.1 PROVIDING RELIEF TO PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF ADDICTION TO ALCOHOL, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A SOCIAL NETWORKING WEBSITE OFFERING PEER SUPPORT FOR ANY MEMBER OF THE PUBLIC, BOTH IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE, WISHING TO ADDRESS THEIR ALCOHOL DEPENDENCY ISSUES; AND 3.1.2 PROMOTING AND RAISING AWARENESS AMONGST PEOPLE ABOUT THE HEALTH RISKS OF ALCOHOL AND THE POSITIVE HEALTH BENEFITS OF SOBRIETY THROUGH ORGANISING WORKSHOPS AND PUBLIC SPEAKING EVENTS, AS WELL AS ANY OTHER ACTIVITIES THAT THE CHARITY TRUSTEES DEEM OF BENEFIT TO THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 MURRAY ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S11 7GG
- Phone:
- 07766397868
- Email:
- enquiries@soberistas.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window