WINSOR MISSION EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Winsor Mission is a local evangelical Christian church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW CYRIL ALDRIDGE | Chair | 17 March 2023 |
|
|||||
JOHN DOUGLAS SYMONS | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Rosemary Barbier | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.35k | £3.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.30k | £2.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIC TENETS OF BIBLICAL CHRISTIANITY {AS SET OUT IN THE JULY 1883 TRUST DEED NAMELY: ?HOLDING AND PROFESSING THE DOCTRINE OF ORIGINAL PURITY OF MAN, THE FALL OF ADAM, THE HOLY TRINITY IN THE UNITY OF THE GODHEAD, THE DEITY AND ATONEMENT OF CHRIST, THE DEITY AND INFLUENCE OF THE HOLY SPIRIT, THE REGENERATION OF MAN BY THE POWER OF THE SPIRIT AND WORD OF GOD, JUSTIFICATION BY FAITH IN CHRIST, HOLINESS OF HEART AND LIFE AND SUCH OTHER VIEWS OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE USUALLY CALLED EVANGELICAL?.] 2. TO CARRY OUT ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES IN FURTHERANCE OF OBJECT 1 ABOVE: [I] REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP, PRAYER, BIBLE STUDY, PREACHING AND TEACHING [II] BAPTISM OF BELIEVERS BY TOTAL IMMERSION; [III] THE COMMUNION OF THE LORD'S SUPPER ON A REGULAR BASIS; [IV] EVANGELISM AND MISSION, LOCALLY, REGIONALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY. [V] NURTURE AND GROWTH OF CHRISTIAN DISCIPLES; [VI] EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR CHRISTIAN AND COMMUNITY SERVICE. [VII] GIVING AND ENCOURAGING PASTORAL CARE; [VIII] SUPPORTING AND ENCOURAGING CHARITABLE SOCIAL ACTION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD; [IX] ENCOURAGING RELATIONSHIPS WITH AND SUPPORTING OTHER CHRISTIANS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Winsor Mission Evangelical Church
Winsor Road
Winsor
SO40 2HE
- Phone:
- 07913492354
- Email:
- hilarypayne88@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window