DUNK'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 1203952
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Dunks Almshouse Charity provides accommodation to local residents in need of housing.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 July 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL LESLIE COLLISON Chair 25 April 2013
DUNK'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
DUNK'S AND SPRINGETT'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DUNK'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Colin Charles Hobday Trustee 01 November 2023
DUNK'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Helena Elisabeth Van Kan Trustee 19 January 2023
DUNK'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Recently registered
DUNK'S AND SPRINGETT'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DUNK'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Gunda Cannon Trustee 10 November 2022
DUNK'S AND SPRINGETT'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DUNK'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
DUNK'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Elizabeth Claire Roberts Trustee 23 July 2020
DUNK'S AND SPRINGETT'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DUNK'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
DUNK'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Colin Andrew Faulkner Trustee 19 April 2018
DUNK'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Recently registered
DUNK'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
DUNK'S AND SPRINGETT'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JOANNE ELIZABETH FAULKNER Trustee 08 January 2013
DUNK'S AND SPRINGETT'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DUNK'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
DUNK'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Recently registered
SAMANTHA MARIE ROSSLYN CORNISH Trustee 28 April 2003
DUNK'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Recently registered
DUNK'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
DUNK'S AND SPRINGETT'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
DUNKS TRUSTEE OFFICE
DUNKS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
RYE ROAD
HAWKHURST
CRANBROOK
TN18 4HF
Phone:
01580388973
Website:

No information available