VETERANS VOLUNTEER SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Veterans Volunteer Service supports military veterans' positive mental and physical health through volunteering in the community. The Veterans Volunteer Service provides a programme of initiatives that utilise military veterans skillsets to build community resilience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Kent
- West Sussex
Governance
- 31 July 2023: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Hart | Chair | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Cooper MCMI-ChMC-FRGS | Trustee | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven King | Trustee | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAR 2023 AS AMENDED ON 25 JUL 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RESETTLEMENT OF FORMER ARMED FORCES PERSONNEL INTO THE CIVILIAN COMMUNITY BY UTILISING EXISTING SKILL SETS, PROVIDING TRAINING AND SUPPORT AND BY FOSTERING GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN FORMER ARMED FORCES PERSONNEL AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 Charles Square
Cinders Lane
BN18 0JX
- Phone:
- 07526846297
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window