LIVING FAITH FELLOWSHIP TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Living Faith Fellowship holds weekly Christian worship services. Weekly Bible studies are held. Weekly Prayer meetings.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 04 December 2023: CIO registration
- 20 February 2024: Funds received from 1054123 LIVING FAITH FELLOWSHIP TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Brian Schofield Rev. | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Ash Russell | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Brenda Eileen Daw | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Daw | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Bates | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Betty Schofield B.A. | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE · TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR IN THE LOCALITY AND ENVIRONS OF SOUTHPORT AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD. · TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID (AREA) AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 LYNDHURST ROAD
SOUTHPORT
PR8 4JT
- Phone:
- 07769959216
- Email:
- info@livingfaith.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.