FIRCROFT COLLEGE OF ADULT EDUCATION

Charity Number: 1204069
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing and promoting social and environmental/climate justice by providing adults with an excellent learning environment for personal, professional and political development.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FIRCROFT COLLEGE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Geoffrey Mark Layer Chair 01 November 2021
WORKERS' EDUCATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
FIRCROFT COLLEGE TRUST
Received: On time
Paul Robert O'Toole Trustee 11 December 2024
None on record
Katherine Ann Clough Trustee 08 January 2024
None on record
Lorna Patricia Phillip Trustee 08 January 2024
None on record
Elliott Moody Trustee 08 January 2024
None on record
Harpreet Samra Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Professor John Aldred Kam Holford Trustee 11 October 2023
None on record
Christopher Matthew Kenny Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Benjamin Jon Shore Trustee 23 March 2022
FIRCROFT COLLEGE TRUST
Received: On time
Eluned Griffith Jones Trustee 15 September 2021
FIRCROFT COLLEGE TRUST
Received: On time
Carole Lesley Parkes Trustee 15 September 2021
FIRCROFT COLLEGE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Robert Masunga Trustee 01 January 2021
FIRCROFT COLLEGE TRUST
Received: On time
Parminder Singh Garcha Trustee 10 July 2019
SIKH NARI MANCH U.K.
Received: On time
FIRCROFT COLLEGE TRUST
Received: On time
VICTORIA COLLEGE LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
Fircroft College of Adult Education
1018 Bristol Road
Selly Oak
BIRMINGHAM
B29 6LH
Phone:
01214720116