1 COMPASS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1Compass helps to support young people by offering youth groups, one on one interventions, and youth projects, to benefit their wellbeing and develop the community. Aimed at young people aged between 8 and 25 that are, or at risk of becoming, excluded from mainstream social, economic, educational, and digital opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Conwy
Governance
- 24 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tim Hall | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phil Davies | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Roberts | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £493 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 May 2023
Charitable objects
3. THE CIO'S OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN OLD COLWYN AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN CONWAY COUNTY BOROUGH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE AGED BETWEEN THE AGES OF 8 AND 16 BY:- A) PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A YOUTH CENTRE FOR THE PURPOSE OF YOUTH SERVICES; B)THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; C) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN SOCIETY, GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND D)ASSOCIATING TOGETHER YOUNG PEOPLE, PARENTS AND CARERS, THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Lavender Centre
Tan Lan community centre
Tan y Lan Road
Old Colwyn
Colwyn Bay
LL29 9BB
- Phone:
- 01492515477
- Email:
- 1compassnihal@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window