WYTHENSHAWE BLACK BELT ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of Community participation in healthy recreation. In particular, the provision of facilities for playing and taking part in martial arts and to advance the education of the public in martial arts by the provision of training, examination and awards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 27 March 2023: CIO registration
- 13 January 2025: Funds received from 1148946 WYTHENSHAWE KENPO JU-JITSU ASSOCIATION
- WYTHENSHAWE BLACKBELT ACADEMY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sabiha Yausmine Nazir | Chair | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Savannah Gaby Lee | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAULA MICHELLE PESTELL | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Raymond Bates | Trustee | 12 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.52k | £5.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.10k | £3.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING AND TAKING PART IN MARTIAL ARTS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MARTIAL ARTS BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, EXAMINATION AND AWARDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite A and B
2nd Floor
Alderman Gatley House
Civic Centre
Wythenshawe
- Phone:
- 07857877199
- Email:
- wkja.ebates@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window