401ST MANCHESTER SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As scouts we are guided by these values Integrity Respect Care Belief Co-operation Scouting takes place when young people, in partnership with adults, work together & Enjoy what they are doing & have fun Take part in activities indoors & outdoors Learn by doing Share in spiritual reflection & make good choices Undertake new & challenging activities Make & live by their Promise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Manchester City
Governance
- 06 February 1970: Standard registration
- 09 August 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 January 2014: Re-registered
- 09 August 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 August 2015: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Susanne Britstone | Chair | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Anne Paula Wertheimer | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Alan Feingold | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Yael Melanie Knight | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Louise Haffner | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
THEO NOYEK | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Williams | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julian Cosky | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Avril Frankl | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUSSEL CONN | Trustee | 22 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MARKS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.11k | £19.45k | £23.33k | £8.43k | £6.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.05k | £7.09k | £15.07k | £8.44k | £10.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 September 2021 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 04/01/1912.
Charitable objects
INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 Bury Old Road
Prestwich
MANCHESTER
M25 0FQ
- Phone:
- 07866375931
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window