Financial history 413TH MANCHESTER (FAIRFIELD MORAVIAN) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.19k £10.34k £2.80k £6.33k £8.39k
Total expenditure £4.62k £4.25k £4.88k £6.81k £8.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A