Women in Tri UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Women in Tri UK, operating also as Fund Her Tri UK, aims to bring women into swim, bike, run and triathlons. We raise funds to support a number of programmes that remove barriers for women, particularly at entry level. We also provide advocacy and work with the industry to drive policy change and ensure triathlon is more gender diverse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £3,870 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 May 2023: CIO registration
- FUND HER TRI UK (Working name)
- WOMEN IN TRI (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bianca Fernandez | Chair | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rute Robalo | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Siddall | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Kennedy | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Lopez | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
LesleyAnne Roddy | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Griffin | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.60k | £23.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.04k | £6.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.87k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 May 2023 as amended on 30 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN TRIATHLON FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY: A) INCREASING THE NUMBER OF WOMEN PARTICIPATING IN TRIATHLON EVENTS; B) PROMOTING AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN TRIATHLONS, TRAINING AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION AND BARRIERS TO PARTICIPATION IN TRIATHLON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 49 MARLBOROUGH MANSIONS
CANNON HILL
LONDON
NW6 1JS
- Phone:
- 07852745776
- Email:
- info@womenintriuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window