PRESCOT DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a safe and secure environment for children and adults to follow the Guiding programme
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £6,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Knowsley
Governance
- 13 January 1964: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
- 16 March 2009: Standard registration
- PRESCOT GUIDE HOUSE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marion Miller | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Hargreaves | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Debra Isles | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Pritchard | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Malone | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.26k | £1.98k | £6.81k | £3.46k | £10.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.57k | £6.66k | £3.80k | £5.17k | £12.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2023 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 January 2022 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 1ST JULY 1939 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1938
Charitable objects
PRESCOT DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
PRESCOT
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Derby Street
PRESCOT
Merseyside
L34 3LE
- Phone:
- 07720777869
- Email:
- guidehouseprescot@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window