FRIENDS OF ST. GILES HILL PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Works for the benefit of visitors to and the inhabitants of Winchester by organising volunteers and raising funds to help preserve, promote, support, and assist in the improvement of St. Giles Hill Park to provide facilities for recreation, social welfare and information for the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 24 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Harry MacDonald Mycock CHort | Chair | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Smith | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Kendal Thorpe | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Dominic Charles Alan Hiscock MSc MBA | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Biden FRSA | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF VISITORS TO AND THE INHABITANTS OF WINCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (‘THE AREA OF BENEFIT’), TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF ST. GILES HILL PARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. GILES HILLTOP
NORTHBROOK CLOSE
WINCHESTER
SO23 0JR
- Phone:
- 07876656954
- Email:
- SGHparkfriends@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window