UMMAH FUNERAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding of funerals under the guide of Islam.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 September 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUSA SINERA TOURAY M S T | Chair | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mahmodou Jaiteh Gikineh | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MAHAMADOU SAHO DANSIRA M S D | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMADOU NIMAGA SUMAREH M N S | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
YUSUFA DRAMMEH NIMAGA Y D N | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY GIVING GRANTS TO ANY MEMBER OF THE PUBLIC WHO WANTS TO PRACTICE AN ISLAMIC BURIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Clifford View
Wakefield
WF2 7LQ
- Phone:
- 01924735333
- Email:
- mtstouray@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window