Financial history 27th Rochdale Scout Group

Charity number: 521663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £2.52k £21.22k £2.42k £2.93k £1.17k
Total expenditure £2.97k £1.43k £2.65k £3.39k £2.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.99k N/A N/A N/A