3RD ROYTON (ST ANNE'S) BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCOUTING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oldham
Governance
- 25 February 1964: Standard registration
- 27 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 May 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNN McGINNITY | Chair | 30 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Keith Hayward | Trustee | 30 May 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/05/2020 | 30/05/2021 | 30/05/2022 | 30/05/2023 | 30/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.80k | £1.94k | £6.51k | £4.56k | £2.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.06k | £2.41k | £3.66k | £6.28k | £2.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 4TH JULY 1963 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
3RD ROYTON (ST. ANNE'S) BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
ROYTON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 BROADWAY
ROYTON
OLDHAM
OL2 5DD
- Phone:
- 01616248449
- Email:
- keith.hayward@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window